Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Labor and Industry, Division of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0145 (SB0001/CH0049)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Stop Work Orders
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0258
Title
Employment Standards - Seating for Employees (Right to Sit Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0719 (SB0420)
Title
Employment of Minors - Opportunities for Work
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0001 /CH0049 (HB0145)
Title
State Finance and Procurement – Prevailing Wage – Stop Work Orders
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0066
Title
Labor and Employment - Hiring - Education Requirements (Give Me A Chance - Job Opportunities Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0420 (HB0719)
Title
Employment of Minors - Opportunities for Work
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0145 (SB0001/CH0049) State Finance and Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Stop Work Orders Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Economic Matters
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0258 Employment Standards - Seating for Employees (Right to Sit Act of 2022) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0719 (SB0420) Employment of Minors - Opportunities for Work Delegate Queen 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0001 /CH0049 (HB0145) State Finance and Procurement – Prevailing Wage – Stop Work Orders Senator Beidle 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 49
Finance
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0066 Labor and Employment - Hiring - Education Requirements (Give Me A Chance - Job Opportunities Act of 2022) Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
1/27/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0420 (HB0719) Employment of Minors - Opportunities for Work Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:34 PM
Click to return on the top page