Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Labor and Industry, Division of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0136 (SB0233)
Title
Employment Standards, Prevailing Wage, and Living Wage - Employer Adverse Actions and Enforcement
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0244 /CH0104
Title
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Civil Penalties - Alterations
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0385 (SB0038)
Title
Wage Payment and Collection - Pay Stubs and Pay Statements - Required Information
Sponsor
Delegate Long, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0465 (SB0436)
Title
Workplace Fraud and Prevailing Wage - Violations - Civil Penalty and Referrals
Sponsor
Delegate Boafo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0649 (SB0525)
Title
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work - Wage Range Transparency
Sponsor
Delegate White Holland
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1084 (SB1061)
Title
Employee Autoimmune Disorder Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Martinez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1172
Title
Federal Public Service Loan Forgiveness Program - Employee Certification and Awareness Materials
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1226 (SB0994)
Title
Maryland Predictable Scheduling Act
Sponsor
Delegate Foley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0038 (HB0385)
Title
Wage Payment and Collection - Pay Stubs and Pay Statements - Required Information
Sponsor
Senator Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0160
Title
Labor and Employment - Payment of Minimum Wage - Tipped Employees
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0233 (HB0136)
Title
Employment Standards, Prevailing Wage, and Living Wage - Employer Adverse Actions - Prohibition
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0436 (HB0465)
Title
Workplace Fraud and Prevailing Wage - Violations - Penalties and Referrals
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0525 (HB0649)
Title
Labor and Employment – Equal Pay for Equal Work – Wage Range Transparency
Sponsor
Senator Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0994 (HB1226)
Title
Maryland Predictable Scheduling Act
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1061 (HB1084)
Title
Employee Autoimmune Disorder Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0136 (SB0233) Employment Standards, Prevailing Wage, and Living Wage - Employer Adverse Actions and Enforcement Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
1/24/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0244 /CH0104 Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Civil Penalties - Alterations Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Economic Matters
1/24/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0385 (SB0038) Wage Payment and Collection - Pay Stubs and Pay Statements - Required Information Delegate Long, J. 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0465 (SB0436) Workplace Fraud and Prevailing Wage - Violations - Civil Penalty and Referrals Delegate Boafo 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0649 (SB0525) Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work - Wage Range Transparency Delegate White Holland 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1084 (SB1061) Employee Autoimmune Disorder Protection Act Delegate Martinez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1172 Federal Public Service Loan Forgiveness Program - Employee Certification and Awareness Materials Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/05/2024 - 12:30 PM
HB1226 (SB0994) Maryland Predictable Scheduling Act Delegate Foley 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0038 (HB0385) Wage Payment and Collection - Pay Stubs and Pay Statements - Required Information Senator Washington, A. 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0160 Labor and Employment - Payment of Minimum Wage - Tipped Employees Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0233 (HB0136) Employment Standards, Prevailing Wage, and Living Wage - Employer Adverse Actions - Prohibition Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0436 (HB0465) Workplace Fraud and Prevailing Wage - Violations - Penalties and Referrals Senator Gile 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0525 (HB0649) Labor and Employment – Equal Pay for Equal Work – Wage Range Transparency Senator Kelly 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0994 (HB1226) Maryland Predictable Scheduling Act Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/12/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1061 (HB1084) Employee Autoimmune Disorder Protection Act Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2024 3:28 PM
Click to return on the top page