Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Land Records -see also- Deeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0049 /CH0057 (SB0062)
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Water and Sewer Lien Registers - Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0050 (SB0061/CH0004)
Title
Active Armed Forces Member - Exemption From Payment of Fees for Certain Court Records
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0051 /CH0487 (SB0066)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0053 (SB0063)
Title
Real Property - Manufactured Homes - Recording of Affidavits of Affixation and Severance - Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054 /CH0488 (SB0064)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0186 (SB0101)
Title
Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0511 /CH0428
Title
Real Property - Residential Property - Ground Leases
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0600 /CH0440 (SB0840)
Title
St. Mary's County - Property Maintenance - Voluntary Agreements
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1035 /CH0114 (SB0439)
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1129 (SB0837)
Title
Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0061 /CH0004 (HB0050)
Title
Active Armed Forces Member - Exemption From Payment of Fees for Certain Court Records
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0062 (HB0049/CH0057)
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Water and Sewer Lien Registers - Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0063 (HB0053)
Title
Real Property - Manufactured Homes - Recording of Affidavits of Affixation and Severance - Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0064 (HB0054/CH0488)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0066 (HB0051/CH0487)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0101 (HB0186)
Title
Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0292
Title
Real Property - Land Records - Fraudulent Recordings
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0439 (HB1035/CH0114)
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0623
Title
Prince George's County - Property Tax Deferrals - Elderly and Disabled Homeowners
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837 (HB1129)
Title
Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0840 (HB0600/CH0440)
Title
St. Mary's County - Property Maintenance - Voluntary Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0049 /CH0057 (SB0062) Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Water and Sewer Lien Registers - Fees Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
Judiciary
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0050 (SB0061/CH0004) Active Armed Forces Member - Exemption From Payment of Fees for Certain Court Records Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0051 /CH0487 (SB0066) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 487
Appropriations
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0053 (SB0063) Real Property - Manufactured Homes - Recording of Affidavits of Affixation and Severance - Fees Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0054 /CH0488 (SB0064) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 488
Judiciary
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0186 (SB0101) Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0511 /CH0428 Real Property - Residential Property - Ground Leases Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0600 /CH0440 (SB0840) St. Mary's County - Property Maintenance - Voluntary Agreements St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1035 /CH0114 (SB0439) Baltimore City - Tax Sales Delegate Oaks 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1129 (SB0837) Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0061 /CH0004 (HB0050) Active Armed Forces Member - Exemption From Payment of Fees for Certain Court Records Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0062 (HB0049/CH0057) Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Water and Sewer Lien Registers - Fees Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0063 (HB0053) Real Property - Manufactured Homes - Recording of Affidavits of Affixation and Severance - Fees Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0064 (HB0054/CH0488) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0066 (HB0051/CH0487) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0101 (HB0186) Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0292 Real Property - Land Records - Fraudulent Recordings Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0439 (HB1035/CH0114) Baltimore City - Tax Sales Senator McFadden 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0623 Prince George's County - Property Tax Deferrals - Elderly and Disabled Homeowners Senator Currie 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0837 (HB1129) Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0840 (HB0600/CH0440) St. Mary's County - Property Maintenance - Voluntary Agreements Senator Waugh 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM
Click to return on the top page