Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Land Records -see also- Deeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0071
Title
Manufactured Homes - Sale of Manufactured Housing Communities (Manufactured Housing Modernization Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0091 /CH0326
Title
Irredeemable Ground Rents – Notice and Filing Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528 /CH0599
Title
Town of Williamsport (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0543 /CH0600
Title
Town of Hancock (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0785 /CH0522 (SB0602)
Title
Courts - Baltimore City Jobs Court Pilot Program and Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1108
Title
Real Property - Land Installment Contracts - Requirements and Vendor Duties and Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1259 (SB0871)
Title
Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act
Sponsor
Delegate Belcastro
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1270 (SB0853)
Title
Maryland Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1345
Title
Sales of Residential Real Property - Offers to Purchase and Transfer Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1471 /CH0197 (SB0978/CH0198)
Title
Garrett County Memorial Hospital – Lease Authorization and Alterations to Board of Governors
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0853 (HB1270)
Title
Maryland Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1259)
Title
Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0967
Title
Tax Sales - Final Judgments in Foreclosure Actions - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0978 /CH0198 (HB1471/CH0197)
Title
Garrett County Memorial Hospital - Lease Authorization and Alterations to Board of Governors
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0980
Title
Property Tax - Tax Sales - Restriction of Bidders
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0071 Manufactured Homes - Sale of Manufactured Housing Communities (Manufactured Housing Modernization Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0091 /CH0326 Irredeemable Ground Rents – Notice and Filing Requirements Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 326
Environment and Transportation
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0528 /CH0599 Town of Williamsport (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance Delegate McKay 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 599
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0543 /CH0600 Town of Hancock (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance Delegate McKay 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 600
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0785 /CH0522 (SB0602) Courts - Baltimore City Jobs Court Pilot Program and Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 522
Judiciary
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
HB1108 Real Property - Land Installment Contracts - Requirements and Vendor Duties and Limitations Delegate Charles 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1259 (SB0871) Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act Delegate Belcastro 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1270 (SB0853) Maryland Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1345 Sales of Residential Real Property - Offers to Purchase and Transfer Tax Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1471 /CH0197 (SB0978/CH0198) Garrett County Memorial Hospital – Lease Authorization and Alterations to Board of Governors Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2022 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0853 (HB1270) Maryland Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0871 (HB1259) Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0967 Tax Sales - Final Judgments in Foreclosure Actions - Revisions Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0978 /CH0198 (HB1471/CH0197) Garrett County Memorial Hospital - Lease Authorization and Alterations to Board of Governors Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0980 Property Tax - Tax Sales - Restriction of Bidders Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:14 PM
Click to return on the top page