Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Leave

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008 (SB0275/CH0048)
Title
Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0108 (SB0524)
Title
Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Energy Performance Targets and Low-Income Housing
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0164
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431 (SB0530)
Title
Maryland Fair Scheduling Act
Sponsor
Delegate Foley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0496
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0849 (SB0671)
Title
Economic Development - Eligibility for State Job Creation Incentives
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096
Title
Economic Development Tax Credit Programs – Qualified Position and Qualified Employee – Definitions
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 /CH0048 (HB0008)
Title
Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0524 (HB0108)
Title
Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Energy Performance Targets and Low-Income Housing
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0530 (HB0431)
Title
Maryland Fair Scheduling Act
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0671 (HB0849)
Title
Economic Development - Eligibility for State Job Creation Incentives
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0949
Title
Scholarships and Police Officer Recruitment
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0008 (SB0275/CH0048) Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022) Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0108 (SB0524) Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Energy Performance Targets and Low-Income Housing Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Economic Matters
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0164 Public Institutions of Higher Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policy Delegate Healey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0431 (SB0530) Maryland Fair Scheduling Act Delegate Foley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0496 Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act 2022) Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0849 (SB0671) Economic Development - Eligibility for State Job Creation Incentives Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1096 Economic Development Tax Credit Programs – Qualified Position and Qualified Employee – Definitions Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0275 /CH0048 (HB0008) Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022) Senator Hayes 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 48
Finance
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0524 (HB0108) Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Energy Performance Targets and Low-Income Housing Senator Feldman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0530 (HB0431) Maryland Fair Scheduling Act Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0671 (HB0849) Economic Development - Eligibility for State Job Creation Incentives Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0949 Scholarships and Police Officer Recruitment Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/31/2022 5:15 PM
Click to return on the top page