Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legal Aid

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0018 (SB0154)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Tenants - Right to Counsel
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0031
Title
Courts - Surcharges and Payment to Special Funds - Prohibited Lease Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0194
Title
Criminal Procedure - Police Officers and Public Defenders - Implicit Bias - Testing, Training, and Evaluation
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0271
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Diversion Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0315 (SB0136)
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Interrogation Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0499
Title
Rental Housing Restitution Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0514 (SB0413)
Title
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0585
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Financial Capabilities and Legal Assistance Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1070
Title
Baltimore City – Landlord and Tenant – Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1197
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education - Legal Counsel and Chief Budget Analyst
Sponsor
Delegate Boteler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1277 (SB0757)
Title
State Personnel Management System – Office of the Public Defender – Placement
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1285
Title
Howard County - Fee for Rental Housing Services - Established Ho. Co. 15-21
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312 (SB0910)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Catastrophic Health Emergencies
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1331 (SB0898)
Title
Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0136 (HB0315)
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Interrogation Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154 (HB0018)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Tenants - Access to Counsel
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0413 (HB0514)
Title
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding – Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0039 (HB0612)
Title
Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0757 (HB1277)
Title
State Personnel Management System - Office of the Public Defender - Placement
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0898 (HB1331)
Title
Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0910 (HB1312)
Title
COVID-19 Eviction and Housing Relief Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0018 (SB0154) Landlord and Tenant - Residential Tenants - Right to Counsel Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (30-15)
Judiciary
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
HB0031 Courts - Surcharges and Payment to Special Funds - Prohibited Lease Provisions Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0032 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021) Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0194 Criminal Procedure - Police Officers and Public Defenders - Implicit Bias - Testing, Training, and Evaluation Delegate Wells 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0271 Public Safety - Law Enforcement Diversion Programs Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 12:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0315 (SB0136) Juvenile Law - Juvenile Interrogation Protection Act Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0499 Rental Housing Restitution Fund - Establishment Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0514 (SB0413) Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0585 Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Financial Capabilities and Legal Assistance Fund Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1070 Baltimore City – Landlord and Tenant – Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1197 Baltimore County Board of Education - Legal Counsel and Chief Budget Analyst Delegate Boteler 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1277 (SB0757) State Personnel Management System – Office of the Public Defender – Placement Delegate Henson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Appropriations
3/12/2021 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1285 Howard County - Fee for Rental Housing Services - Established Ho. Co. 15-21 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1312 (SB0910) Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Catastrophic Health Emergencies Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
HB1331 (SB0898) Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021 Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0136 (HB0315) Juvenile Law - Juvenile Interrogation Protection Act Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0154 (HB0018) Landlord and Tenant - Residential Tenants - Access to Counsel Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0413 (HB0514) Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding – Abandoned Property Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0496 /CH0039 (HB0612) Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0708 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0757 (HB1277) State Personnel Management System - Office of the Public Defender - Placement Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0898 (HB1331) Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021 Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0910 (HB1312) COVID-19 Eviction and Housing Relief Act of 2021 Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 5:53 PM
Click to return on the top page