Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legal Aid

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0114 (SB0129)
Title
Access to Counsel in Immigration Proceedings Program
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0269 (SB0053/CH0050)
Title
Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0443 (SB0228/CH0037)
Title
Maryland Corps Program - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0693
Title
Courts - Surcharges and Payment to Special Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0712 (SB0521)
Title
Landlord and Tenant – Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund – Mandatory Appropriation
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0724 (SB0662/CH0040)
Title
Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046 (SB0762)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139
Title
Public Funds - Prohibition on Expenditures for Abortion (Abortion Subsidy Prohibition Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0053 /CH0050 (HB0269)
Title
Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0129 (HB0114)
Title
Access to Counsel in Immigration Proceedings Program
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0228 /CH0037 (HB0443)
Title
Maryland Corps Program – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0521 (HB0712)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Mandatory Appropriation
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0662 /CH0040 (HB0724)
Title
Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0762 (HB1046)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0842
Title
Criminal Procedure – Petition to Modify or Reduce Sentence (Maryland Second Look Act)
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0114 (SB0129) Access to Counsel in Immigration Proceedings Program Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0269 (SB0053/CH0050) Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
Rules
HB0443 (SB0228/CH0037) Maryland Corps Program - Revisions Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0693 Courts - Surcharges and Payment to Special Funds Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0712 (SB0521) Landlord and Tenant – Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund – Mandatory Appropriation Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0724 (SB0662/CH0040) Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Funding Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1046 (SB0762) Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 Public Funds - Prohibition on Expenditures for Abortion (Abortion Subsidy Prohibition Act) Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0053 /CH0050 (HB0269) Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act Senator Carter 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 50
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2022 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0129 (HB0114) Access to Counsel in Immigration Proceedings Program Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0228 /CH0037 (HB0443) Maryland Corps Program – Revisions Senator Ferguson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 37
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
3/22/2022 - 1:40 PM
SB0521 (HB0712) Landlord and Tenant - Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Mandatory Appropriation Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0662 /CH0040 (HB0724) Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Funding Senator Zucker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 40
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
SB0762 (HB1046) Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0833 Cannabis Reform Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0842 Criminal Procedure – Petition to Modify or Reduce Sentence (Maryland Second Look Act) Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:39 PM
Click to return on the top page