Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Legal Aid

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032 (SB0043)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Forensic Review Board - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0103 (SB0154)
Title
Access to Counsel in Evictions – Task Force Termination and Special Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0180
Title
Public Safety - Gun Violence Victim Relocation Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Addison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0876
Title
Access to Counsel in Evictions - Special Fund - Alteration
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1156
Title
Correctional Services - Maryland Parole Commission - Members and Hearing Examiners
Sponsor
Delegate Phillips
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1177
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Tenant Repair and Maintenance Complaint Hotline - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1257
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Fee Disclosures
Sponsor
Delegate Vogel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1289
Title
Drug and Alcohol Treatment Programs - Discharge of Patients and Referral Services - Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1445
Title
Licensed Funeral Establishments - Provision of Fact Sheet on Real Property Ownership
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0039
Title
Criminal Procedure - Petition to Modify or Reduce Sentence (Maryland Second Look Act)
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0043 (HB0032)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Forensic Review Board - Established
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154 (HB0103)
Title
Access to Counsel in Evictions - Task Force and Special Fund
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0032 (SB0043) Maryland Department of Health - Forensic Review Board - Established Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
1/29/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Judicial Proceedings
HB0103 (SB0154) Access to Counsel in Evictions – Task Force Termination and Special Fund Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0180 Public Safety - Gun Violence Victim Relocation Program - Establishment Delegate Addison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 3:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2025 - 3:00 PM
HB0876 Access to Counsel in Evictions - Special Fund - Alteration Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1156 Correctional Services - Maryland Parole Commission - Members and Hearing Examiners Delegate Phillips 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1177 Landlord and Tenant - Tenant Repair and Maintenance Complaint Hotline - Establishment Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1257 Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Fee Disclosures Delegate Vogel 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1289 Drug and Alcohol Treatment Programs - Discharge of Patients and Referral Services - Standards Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 2:40 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2025 - 2:40 PM
HB1445 Licensed Funeral Establishments - Provision of Fact Sheet on Real Property Ownership Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 3:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2025 - 3:00 PM
SB0039 Criminal Procedure - Petition to Modify or Reduce Sentence (Maryland Second Look Act) Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0043 (HB0032) Maryland Department of Health - Forensic Review Board - Established Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
1/28/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0154 (HB0103) Access to Counsel in Evictions - Task Force and Special Fund Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
1/15/2025 - 10:30 AM
Judicial Proceedings
Appropriations
3/26/2025 - 2:30 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/7/2025 10:18 PM
Click to return on the top page