Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation -see also- Correct Leg; Cur Leg; Emerg Bills

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0150
Title
State Government - House of Delegates - Bill Sponsorship - Limit
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0288 /CH0158 (SB0183)
Title
Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0447
Title
Judges - Selection, Election, Tenure, and Continuance in Office
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0470 (SB0522)
Title
Public Health - Commission on Universal Health Care
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0786
Title
Department of Human Services, Maryland Department of Health, and Department of Education - Easing Access to Family Support Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0997
Title
Equal Protection for Unborn Human Life Act
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0005
Title
United States of America – District of Columbia – Statehood
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0006
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0183 (HB0288/CH0158)
Title
Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328
Title
Anne Arundel County - Landlord and Tenant - Procedures for Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0522 (HB0470)
Title
Public Health - Commission on Universal Health Care
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0914 /CH0522
Title
Sheriff of Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0001
Title
Congressional Action - Surprise Billing - Air Ambulance
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0150 State Government - House of Delegates - Bill Sponsorship - Limit Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 9:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/22/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0288 /CH0158 (SB0183) Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact Delegate Charles 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0447 Judges - Selection, Election, Tenure, and Continuance in Office Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
HB0470 (SB0522) Public Health - Commission on Universal Health Care Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0786 Department of Human Services, Maryland Department of Health, and Department of Education - Easing Access to Family Support Programs Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0997 Equal Protection for Unborn Human Life Act Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2021 - 4:00 PM
HJ0005 United States of America – District of Columbia – Statehood Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 9:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/15/2021 - 9:30 AM
HJ0006 United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 9:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/15/2021 - 9:30 AM
SB0183 (HB0288/CH0158) Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact Senator Young 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0328 Anne Arundel County - Landlord and Tenant - Procedures for Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0522 (HB0470) Public Health - Commission on Universal Health Care Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0914 /CH0522 Sheriff of Baltimore City Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 522
Finance
3/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SJ0001 Congressional Action - Surprise Billing - Air Ambulance Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:18 PM
Click to return on the top page