Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation -see also- Correct Leg; Cur Leg; Emerg Bills

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0152
Title
Public Advocate Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0320 (SB0063)
Title
General Assembly - Residency Requirement - Enforcement - Factors
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0416 (SB0399)
Title
State Government - Quasi-Governmental Units - Oversight and Governance
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0694 /CH0683 (SB0944)
Title
Hospitals - Financial Assistance - Medical Bill Reimbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1428
Title
Code Counties - Legislative Procedure - Notice Requirements
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0011
Title
Workgroup on Online Consumer Personal Information Privacy
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0035
Title
Charles County - Program Open Space - General Assembly Approval
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0056
Title
Program Open Space - Local Plans and Programs - General Assembly Approval
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0063 (HB0320)
Title
General Assembly – Residency Requirement – Enforcement – Factors
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0347
Title
Anne Arundel County - Landlord and Tenant - Procedures for Failure to Pay Rent
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0399 (HB0416)
Title
State Government - Quasi-Governmental Units - Oversight and Governance
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0570
Title
Public Ethics – Former Secretary, Deputy Secretary, or Assistant Secretary of a Principal Department – Employment Restrictions
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0152 Public Advocate Act of 2022 Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/25/2022 - 2:30 PM
HB0320 (SB0063) General Assembly - Residency Requirement - Enforcement - Factors Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0416 (SB0399) State Government - Quasi-Governmental Units - Oversight and Governance Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0694 /CH0683 (SB0944) Hospitals - Financial Assistance - Medical Bill Reimbursement Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 683
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1428 Code Counties - Legislative Procedure - Notice Requirements Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0011 Workgroup on Online Consumer Personal Information Privacy Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0035 Charles County - Program Open Space - General Assembly Approval Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0056 Program Open Space - Local Plans and Programs - General Assembly Approval Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0063 (HB0320) General Assembly – Residency Requirement – Enforcement – Factors Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0347 Anne Arundel County - Landlord and Tenant - Procedures for Failure to Pay Rent Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0399 (HB0416) State Government - Quasi-Governmental Units - Oversight and Governance President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0570 Public Ethics – Former Secretary, Deputy Secretary, or Assistant Secretary of a Principal Department – Employment Restrictions Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:22 PM
Click to return on the top page