Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Libel and Slander

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0434 (SB0167)
Title
Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0629 (SB0549)
Title
Civil Actions - Immunity - Disclosure of Allegations of Sexually Assaultive Behavior (Stop Silencing Survivors Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0663
Title
Civil Actions - Sexual Deepfake Representations and Revenge Porn
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0955
Title
Forged Digital Likenesses - Distribution - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0167 (HB0434)
Title
Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0360
Title
Revenge Porn - Definition of Visual Representation and Civil Action
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0362
Title
Forged Digital Likenesses - Distribution - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0549 (HB0629)
Title
Civil Actions - Immunity - Disclosure of Allegations of Sexually Assaultive Behavior (Stop Silencing Survivors Act)
Sponsor
Senator Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0434 (SB0167) Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0629 (SB0549) Civil Actions - Immunity - Disclosure of Allegations of Sexually Assaultive Behavior (Stop Silencing Survivors Act) Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0663 Civil Actions - Sexual Deepfake Representations and Revenge Porn Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 11:00 a.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2025 - 11:00 AM
HB0955 Forged Digital Likenesses - Distribution - Prohibition Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
SB0167 (HB0434) Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/15 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/15/2025 - 12:00 PM
SB0360 Revenge Porn - Definition of Visual Representation and Civil Action Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2025 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/26/2025 - 3:15 PM
SB0362 Forged Digital Likenesses - Distribution - Prohibition Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2025 - 11:00 AM
SB0549 (HB0629) Civil Actions - Immunity - Disclosure of Allegations of Sexually Assaultive Behavior (Stop Silencing Survivors Act) Senator Love 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/11/2025 4:54 PM
Click to return on the top page