Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Libraries -see also- Archives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045 /CH0747 (SB0138/CH0748)
Title
Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Forbes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0097 (SB0066/CH0074)
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Statewide Broadband - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0436 /CH0401 (SB0477/CH0402)
Title
Enoch Pratt Free Library - Operating Hours and Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0518 /CH0411 (SB0432/CH0412)
Title
Public Libraries - Electronic Literary Product Licenses - Access
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1374 /CH0576
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0066 /CH0074 (HB0097)
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Statewide Broadband - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0138 /CH0748 (HB0045/CH0747)
Title
Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0432 /CH0412 (HB0518/CH0411)
Title
Public Libraries - Electronic Literary Product Licenses - Access
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0477 /CH0402 (HB0436/CH0401)
Title
Enoch Pratt Free Library - Operating Hours and Funding
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0045 /CH0747 (SB0138/CH0748) Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining Delegate Forbes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 747
Appropriations
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0097 (SB0066/CH0074) Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Statewide Broadband - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021) Delegate Lierman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB0436 /CH0401 (SB0477/CH0402) Enoch Pratt Free Library - Operating Hours and Funding Delegate Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 401
Appropriations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0518 /CH0411 (SB0432/CH0412) Public Libraries - Electronic Literary Product Licenses - Access Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 411
Ways and Means
2/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1374 /CH0576 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576
Appropriations
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0066 /CH0074 (HB0097) Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Statewide Broadband - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021) Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
SB0138 /CH0748 (HB0045/CH0747) Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining Senator Hettleman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 748
Finance
2/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0432 /CH0412 (HB0518/CH0411) Public Libraries - Electronic Literary Product Licenses - Access Senator King 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 412
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0477 /CH0402 (HB0436/CH0401) Enoch Pratt Free Library - Operating Hours and Funding Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 402
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:18 AM
Click to return on the top page