Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Libraries -see also- Archives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0196
Title
Public Schools and County Boards of Education - Publication of School Library Catalogs
Sponsor
Delegate Thiam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0383 /CH0446 (SB0438/CH0447)
Title
Young Readers Programs – Establishment (Young Readers Program Expansion Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0685 (SB0448)
Title
Education – Regional Resource Centers and Libraries – Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Branch, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0708
Title
Comprehensive Climate Solutions
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0770
Title
Enoch Pratt Free Library - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1225
Title
Education – Harford County Public Library – Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1249 /CH0362 (SB0847/CH0363)
Title
Libraries - Capital Projects - State Share Adjustments
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0108
Title
Charles County Public Library – Imagination Library Program – Funding
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0204 /CH0128
Title
State Libraries – Maryland State Library Board – Membership
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0282
Title
Workgroup on Screening Related to Adverse Childhood Experiences
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0438 /CH0447 (HB0383/CH0446)
Title
Young Readers Programs - Establishment (Young Readers Program Expansion Act)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0448 (HB0685)
Title
Education - Regional Resource Centers and Libraries - Funding
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0847 /CH0363 (HB1249/CH0362)
Title
Libraries – Capital Projects – State Share Adjustments
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0196 Public Schools and County Boards of Education - Publication of School Library Catalogs Delegate Thiam 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0383 /CH0446 (SB0438/CH0447) Young Readers Programs – Establishment (Young Readers Program Expansion Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0685 (SB0448) Education – Regional Resource Centers and Libraries – Funding Delegate Branch, C. 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0708 Comprehensive Climate Solutions Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0770 Enoch Pratt Free Library - Collective Bargaining Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB1225 Education – Harford County Public Library – Collective Bargaining Delegate Johnson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1249 /CH0362 (SB0847/CH0363) Libraries - Capital Projects - State Share Adjustments Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0108 Charles County Public Library – Imagination Library Program – Funding Senator Ellis 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0204 /CH0128 State Libraries – Maryland State Library Board – Membership Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0282 Workgroup on Screening Related to Adverse Childhood Experiences Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0438 /CH0447 (HB0383/CH0446) Young Readers Programs - Establishment (Young Readers Program Expansion Act) Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0448 (HB0685) Education - Regional Resource Centers and Libraries - Funding Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2022 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0847 /CH0363 (HB1249/CH0362) Libraries – Capital Projects – State Share Adjustments Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 3:11 PM
Click to return on the top page