Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Libraries -see also- Archives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0025
Title
Public Schools - Sexually Explicit Materials - Prohibited in Libraries and Media Centers
Sponsor
Delegate Mangione
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0208 (SB0250/CH0208)
Title
County Public Libraries - Minors, Children, and Teens - Prohibited Practices
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0475 /CH0270
Title
Education - Open-Source Phonics Matching Grant Program - Establishment (Open-Source Phonics Matching Grant Program Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0489 (SB0434/CH0180)
Title
Education - State Library Resource Center - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0609 /CH0132 (SB0591)
Title
Education - Public Libraries - Collective Bargaining (Library Workers Empowerment Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0785 /CH0129 (SB0738/CH0130)
Title
Freedom to Read Act
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0825 /CH0055 (SB0248/CH0056)
Title
Libraries - Regional Resource Centers - Governing Board Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1325
Title
Individuals Experiencing Homelessness - Address Requirements - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Addison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1463 (SB0848)
Title
Enoch Pratt Free Library - Capital Project Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Edelson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0163
Title
Charles County Public Library - Imagination Library Program - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0248 /CH0056 (HB0825/CH0055)
Title
Libraries - Regional Resource Centers - Governing Board Membership
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0250 /CH0208 (HB0208)
Title
County Public Libraries - Minors, Children, and Teens - Prohibited Practices
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0399
Title
Cannabis - Advertising - Prohibited Locations
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0434 /CH0180 (HB0489)
Title
Education - State Library Resource Center - Funding
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0591 (HB0609/CH0132)
Title
Education - Public Libraries - Collective Bargaining (Library Workers Empowerment Act)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0738 /CH0130 (HB0785/CH0129)
Title
Freedom to Read Act
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0848 (HB1463)
Title
Enoch Pratt Free Library - Capital Project Funding
Sponsor
Senator Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0966 /CH0722
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1080 /CH0630 (HB0983/CH0631)
Title
State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0025 Public Schools - Sexually Explicit Materials - Prohibited in Libraries and Media Centers Delegate Mangione 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0208 (SB0250/CH0208) County Public Libraries - Minors, Children, and Teens - Prohibited Practices Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Ways and Means
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0475 /CH0270 Education - Open-Source Phonics Matching Grant Program - Establishment (Open-Source Phonics Matching Grant Program Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Ways and Means
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0489 (SB0434/CH0180) Education - State Library Resource Center - Funding Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Rules
HB0609 /CH0132 (SB0591) Education - Public Libraries - Collective Bargaining (Library Workers Empowerment Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Appropriations
2/13/2024 - 12:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0785 /CH0129 (SB0738/CH0130) Freedom to Read Act Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Ways and Means
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0825 /CH0055 (SB0248/CH0056) Libraries - Regional Resource Centers - Governing Board Membership Delegate Adams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55
Ways and Means
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1325 Individuals Experiencing Homelessness - Address Requirements - Prohibition Delegate Addison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1463 (SB0848) Enoch Pratt Free Library - Capital Project Funding Delegate Edelson 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Appropriations
Appropriations
SB0163 Charles County Public Library - Imagination Library Program - Funding Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2024 - 12:00 PM
SB0248 /CH0056 (HB0825/CH0055) Libraries - Regional Resource Centers - Governing Board Membership Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 56
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/17/2024 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0250 /CH0208 (HB0208) County Public Libraries - Minors, Children, and Teens - Prohibited Practices Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/17/2024 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0399 Cannabis - Advertising - Prohibited Locations Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0434 /CH0180 (HB0489) Education - State Library Resource Center - Funding Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Budget and Taxation
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0591 (HB0609/CH0132) Education - Public Libraries - Collective Bargaining (Library Workers Empowerment Act) Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0738 /CH0130 (HB0785/CH0129) Freedom to Read Act Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/23/2024 - 9:00 AM
Ways and Means
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0848 (HB1463) Enoch Pratt Free Library - Capital Project Funding Senator Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0966 /CH0722 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 722
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB1080 /CH0630 (HB0983/CH0631) State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 630
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:37 PM
Click to return on the top page