Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

License Plates -see also- Motor Vehicle Registration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0470 /CH0566 (SB0322)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Obscured, Modified, or Blocked Registration Plates and Registration Plate Covers
Sponsor
Delegate Ziegler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0635 (SB0292)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Secondary Enforcement and Admissibility of Evidence
Sponsor
Delegate Phillips
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1226 (SB0600/CH0571)
Title
Baltimore City and Takoma Park - Stop Sign Monitoring Systems - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0292 (HB0635)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Secondary Enforcement and Admissibility of Evidence
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0600 /CH0571 (HB1226)
Title
Baltimore City and Takoma Park - Stop Sign Monitoring Systems - Authorization of Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0470 /CH0566 (SB0322) Vehicle Laws - Obscured, Modified, or Blocked Registration Plates and Registration Plate Covers Delegate Ziegler 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 566
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0635 (SB0292) Motor Vehicles - Secondary Enforcement and Admissibility of Evidence Delegate Phillips 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB1226 (SB0600/CH0571) Baltimore City and Takoma Park - Stop Sign Monitoring Systems - Authorization Delegate Young 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0292 (HB0635) Motor Vehicles - Secondary Enforcement and Admissibility of Evidence Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0600 /CH0571 (HB1226) Baltimore City and Takoma Park - Stop Sign Monitoring Systems - Authorization of Pilot Program Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 571
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/15/2025 3:10 PM
Click to return on the top page