Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Lie Detection

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0565 /CH0121 (SB0372/CH0122)
Title
Carroll County - Detention Center - Polygraph Testing
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0372 /CH0122 (HB0565/CH0121)
Title
Carroll County - Detention Center - Polygraph Testing
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0565 /CH0121 (SB0372/CH0122) Carroll County - Detention Center - Polygraph Testing Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0372 /CH0122 (HB0565/CH0121) Carroll County - Detention Center - Polygraph Testing Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM
Click to return on the top page