Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Liens -see also- Mechanics' Liens

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0266
Title
Condominiums - Lien Priority - Unpaid Water and Sewer Charges
Sponsor
Delegate Rey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0408 /CH0539
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program PG/MC 103-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0556 /CH0233 (SB0466)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1007 (SB0883)
Title
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and Rules
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1112 (SB0951/CH0568)
Title
Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1178 /CH0313 (SB0925/CH0314)
Title
Property Tax - Liability for Payment of Tax on Leased Property
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1391
Title
Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1409
Title
Baltimore City – Tax Sales of Real Property – Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0035
Title
Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - District Court Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0216
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Priority of Liens - Included Charges
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0466 (HB0556/CH0233)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0755 /CH0340
Title
Credit Regulation - Escrow Accounts - Water and Sewer Facilities Assessments
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0883 (HB1007)
Title
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and Rules
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0925 /CH0314 (HB1178/CH0313)
Title
Property Tax - Liability for Payment of Tax on Leased Property
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0951 /CH0568 (HB1112)
Title
Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0952 /CH0059
Title
Tax Sales – Homeowner Protections
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0953
Title
Recordation Tax – Collection by State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Distribution
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0954 (HB1246)
Title
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1098 /CH0714
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Water Liens
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0266 Condominiums - Lien Priority - Unpaid Water and Sewer Charges Delegate Rey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0408 /CH0539 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program PG/MC 103-18 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 539
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0556 /CH0233 (SB0466) Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees Delegate Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1007 (SB0883) Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and Rules Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1112 (SB0951/CH0568) Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1178 /CH0313 (SB0925/CH0314) Property Tax - Liability for Payment of Tax on Leased Property Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1391 Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1409 Baltimore City – Tax Sales of Real Property – Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act) Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0035 Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - District Court Jurisdiction Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0216 Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Priority of Liens - Included Charges Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0466 (HB0556/CH0233) Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0755 /CH0340 Credit Regulation - Escrow Accounts - Water and Sewer Facilities Assessments Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0883 (HB1007) Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and Rules Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0925 /CH0314 (HB1178/CH0313) Property Tax - Liability for Payment of Tax on Leased Property Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0951 /CH0568 (HB1112) Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 568
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0952 /CH0059 Tax Sales – Homeowner Protections Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0953 Recordation Tax – Collection by State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Distribution Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0954 (HB1246) Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1098 /CH0714 Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Water Liens Senator Robinson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 714
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/09/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM
Click to return on the top page