Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Liens

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0402 (SB0221)
Title
Department of the Environment - Enforcement Authority
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0487 /CH0575 (SB0613)
Title
Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Foley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0979
Title
Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program - Automatic Enrollment and Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1138 (SB0809)
Title
Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Easy Application and Automatic Renewal
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1194
Title
Condominiums - Assessment Late Fees and Liens - Notice and Timing
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0221 (HB0402)
Title
Department of the Environment – Enforcement Authority
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0613 (HB0487/CH0575)
Title
Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0809 (HB1138)
Title
Homeowners’ Property Tax Credit – Easy Application and Automatic Renewal
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939
Title
Tax Sales - Property Maintenance and Nuisance Condition Violation Judgments
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0402 (SB0221) Department of the Environment - Enforcement Authority Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0487 /CH0575 (SB0613) Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements Delegate Foley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 575
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0979 Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program - Automatic Enrollment and Funding Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1138 (SB0809) Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Easy Application and Automatic Renewal Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1194 Condominiums - Assessment Late Fees and Liens - Notice and Timing Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0221 (HB0402) Department of the Environment – Enforcement Authority President 6 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0613 (HB0487/CH0575) Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0809 (HB1138) Homeowners’ Property Tax Credit – Easy Application and Automatic Renewal Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0939 Tax Sales - Property Maintenance and Nuisance Condition Violation Judgments Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:06 PM
Click to return on the top page