Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Litter

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0036
Title
Environment – Packaging, Containers, and Paper Products – Producer Responsibility
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0099
Title
Beverage Container Deposit Program - Establishment and Advisory Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0455 (SB0585)
Title
Agriculture - Processing of Poultry Litter for Alternative Use
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0458
Title
Program Open Space - Local Projects - Visitor Behavior Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1114
Title
Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law – Yard Waste – Disposal on Highways
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0026
Title
State Highway Administration - State Highways and Interstate Highways - Litter Collection and Mowing
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0585 (HB0455)
Title
Agriculture - Processing of Poultry Litter for Alternative Use
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0847
Title
Department of Transportation – Vehicle Litter Reporting Program
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0036 Environment – Packaging, Containers, and Paper Products – Producer Responsibility Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB0099 Beverage Container Deposit Program - Establishment and Advisory Commission Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB0455 (SB0585) Agriculture - Processing of Poultry Litter for Alternative Use Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0458 Program Open Space - Local Projects - Visitor Behavior Policies Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1114 Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law – Yard Waste – Disposal on Highways Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0026 State Highway Administration - State Highways and Interstate Highways - Litter Collection and Mowing Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0585 (HB0455) Agriculture - Processing of Poultry Litter for Alternative Use Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0847 Department of Transportation – Vehicle Litter Reporting Program Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/25/2021 1:52 PM
Click to return on the top page