Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Lobbying

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0230 /CH0073 (SB0251/CH0074)
Title
Maryland Public Ethics Law - Training and Financial Disclosure Requirements - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0960
Title
Investor-Owned Electric, Gas, and Gas and Electric Companies - Cost Recovery - Limitations and Reporting Requirements (Ratepayer Freedom Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1297
Title
Public Ethics - Local Government and School Boards - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1542
Title
Maryland Public Ethics Law - Regulated Lobbyists - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1554 (SB1045)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Business Services - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0251 /CH0074 (HB0230/CH0073)
Title
Maryland Public Ethics Law - Training and Financial Disclosure Requirements - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1045 (HB1554)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Business Services - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0230 /CH0073 (SB0251/CH0074) Maryland Public Ethics Law - Training and Financial Disclosure Requirements - Revisions Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Environment and Transportation
1/30/2025 - 1:30 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0960 Investor-Owned Electric, Gas, and Gas and Electric Companies - Cost Recovery - Limitations and Reporting Requirements (Ratepayer Freedom Act) Delegate Johnson, A. 2 2 In the House - Special Order until 03/17 (Delegate Grammer) Adopted
Economic Matters
3/13/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1297 Public Ethics - Local Government and School Boards - Requirements Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Reassigned to Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1542 Maryland Public Ethics Law - Regulated Lobbyists - Reporting Requirements Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1554 (SB1045) Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Business Services - Alterations Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0251 /CH0074 (HB0230/CH0073) Maryland Public Ethics Law - Training and Financial Disclosure Requirements - Revisions Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/15/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB1045 (HB1554) Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Business Services - Alterations Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2025 - 3:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2025 3:48 PM
Click to return on the top page