Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Long-Term Care -see also- Continuing Care; Nursing Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0059
Title
Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rates - Limitation
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0071
Title
Program of All-Inclusive Care for the Elderly ("PACE") - Limit on Number of Providers - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0945
Title
Long–Term Care Insurance – Premium Rate Increases – Restriction (Equity in Long–Term Care Insurance Premiums Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0946 /CH0508
Title
Long-Term Care Insurance - Contingent Benefit Upon Lapse
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0983
Title
Long-Term Care Insurance - Limitation on Renewal Premium Rate Increases
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1215 /CH0445 (SB0630)
Title
Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1799
Title
Income Tax – Credit for Long–Term Care Premiums
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0016
Title
Health Care Facilities - Nursing Homes - Limit on Residents per Multiple Occupancy Bedroom
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0075
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0108 /CH0661
Title
Regulation of Health Care Programs, Medical Laboratories, Tissue Banks, and Health Care Facilities - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0206
Title
Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rates and Benefits
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0630 (HB1215/CH0445)
Title
Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0059 Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rates - Limitation Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB0071 Program of All-Inclusive Care for the Elderly ("PACE") - Limit on Number of Providers - Prohibition Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB0945 Long–Term Care Insurance – Premium Rate Increases – Restriction (Equity in Long–Term Care Insurance Premiums Act) Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0946 /CH0508 Long-Term Care Insurance - Contingent Benefit Upon Lapse Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 508
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/09/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0983 Long-Term Care Insurance - Limitation on Renewal Premium Rate Increases Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1215 /CH0445 (SB0630) Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1799 Income Tax – Credit for Long–Term Care Premiums Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0016 Health Care Facilities - Nursing Homes - Limit on Residents per Multiple Occupancy Bedroom Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0075 Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:15 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/24/2018 - 2:15 PM
SB0108 /CH0661 Regulation of Health Care Programs, Medical Laboratories, Tissue Banks, and Health Care Facilities - Revisions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 661
Finance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0206 Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rates and Benefits Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0630 (HB1215/CH0445) Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided Senator Madaleno 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM
Click to return on the top page