Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Long-Term Care -see also- Continuing Care; Nursing Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0062 (SB0058)
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums (Long-Term Care Relief Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0981 (SB0863)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Personal Care Aides - Reimbursement and Required Wage
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1237
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0010
Title
Workers' Compensation - COVID-19 Occupational Disease Presumption
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0058 (HB0062)
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums (Long-Term Care Relief Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0863 (HB0981)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Personal Care Aides – Reimbursement and Required Wage
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0062 (SB0058) Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums (Long-Term Care Relief Act of 2022) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0981 (SB0863) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Personal Care Aides - Reimbursement and Required Wage Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2022 - 3:00 PM
HB1237 Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0010 Workers' Compensation - COVID-19 Occupational Disease Presumption Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0058 (HB0062) Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums (Long-Term Care Relief Act of 2022) Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0863 (HB0981) Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Personal Care Aides – Reimbursement and Required Wage Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/9/2022 2:05 PM
Click to return on the top page