Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Managed Care Organizations -see also- Health Maint Orgs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1290 /CH0309
Title
Medicaid Managed Care Organizations - Pharmacy Networks - Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1291
Title
Medicaid Managed Care Organizations - Enrollees Access to Pharmacy Services (Any Willing Pharmacy)
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1290 /CH0309 Medicaid Managed Care Organizations - Pharmacy Networks - Plan Delegate Adams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/13/2015 - 9:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
HB1291 Medicaid Managed Care Organizations - Enrollees Access to Pharmacy Services (Any Willing Pharmacy) Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM
Click to return on the top page