Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Managers and Supervisors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0026
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 (SB0078)
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0299 (SB0224)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards and Conditions - Definition of Employer
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0419 (SB0390)
Title
State Government - Information Technology - Cybersecurity
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0448 /CH0108
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensees - Supervision of Apprentices
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0455
Title
State Personnel - Implicit Bias Awareness Training - Required
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0580 /CH0047 (SB0475)
Title
Maryland Transit Administration Police – Collective Bargaining – Supervisors and Sergeants
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1225
Title
Education – Harford County Public Library – Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1455
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Authority Over Infrastructure - Staffing and Operations
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0078 (HB0072)
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law - Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0188 /CH0121
Title
Insurance - Managing General Agents - Review Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0390 (HB0419)
Title
State Government - Information Technology - Cybersecurity
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0475 (HB0580/CH0047)
Title
Maryland Transit Administration Police - Collective Bargaining - Supervisors and Sergeants
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0541 /CH0039 (HB0727)
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0673 /CH0203
Title
Natural Resources Police Force - Employees - Authority of Secretary
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0026 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0072 (SB0078) Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act) Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB0299 (SB0224) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards and Conditions - Definition of Employer Speaker 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0419 (SB0390) State Government - Information Technology - Cybersecurity Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0448 /CH0108 State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensees - Supervision of Apprentices Delegate Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Economic Matters
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0455 State Personnel - Implicit Bias Awareness Training - Required Delegate Wells 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0580 /CH0047 (SB0475) Maryland Transit Administration Police – Collective Bargaining – Supervisors and Sergeants Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 47
Appropriations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1225 Education – Harford County Public Library – Collective Bargaining Delegate Johnson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1455 Health Occupations Boards - Authority Over Infrastructure - Staffing and Operations Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0078 (HB0072) Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law - Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act) Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0154 Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0188 /CH0121 Insurance - Managing General Agents - Review Requirements Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0390 (HB0419) State Government - Information Technology - Cybersecurity President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0475 (HB0580/CH0047) Maryland Transit Administration Police - Collective Bargaining - Supervisors and Sergeants Senator Beidle 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Finance
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0541 /CH0039 (HB0727) Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 39
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
Appropriations
SB0673 /CH0203 Natural Resources Police Force - Employees - Authority of Secretary Senator Bailey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2022 - 3:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:29 AM
Click to return on the top page