Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Manslaughter -see also- Homicide; Murder

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0652 (SB0454)
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Employees - Prohibited Convictions
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0977 (SB0364)
Title
Criminal Law - Manslaughter by Vehicle or Vessel - Increased Penalties (Jamari's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0364 (HB0977)
Title
Criminal Law - Manslaughter by Vehicle or Vessel - Increased Penalties (Jamari's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0454 (HB0652)
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Employees - Prohibited Convictions
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0652 (SB0454) Department of Juvenile Services - Employees - Prohibited Convictions Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0977 (SB0364) Criminal Law - Manslaughter by Vehicle or Vessel - Increased Penalties (Jamari's Law) Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 11:00 a.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2025 - 11:00 AM
SB0364 (HB0977) Criminal Law - Manslaughter by Vehicle or Vessel - Increased Penalties (Jamari's Law) Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 10:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2025 - 10:00 AM
SB0454 (HB0652) Department of Juvenile Services - Employees - Prohibited Convictions Senator McKay 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 10:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2025 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/17/2025 10:59 AM
Click to return on the top page