Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Maps and Charts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0019
Title
Education - School Construction - Pedestrian Safety Plans (Safe Walk to School Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0505
Title
Montgomery County - Land Use Documents - Certification PG/MC 107-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0706 (SB0630/CH0482)
Title
Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Office of Resilience
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0784 /CH0420
Title
Department of Natural Resources - Irreplaceable Natural Areas Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0882 /CH0089
Title
Natural Resources – Pocomoke River Wildland – Alteration of Boundaries
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0897 /CH0061
Title
Economic Development - Sports Entertainment Facilities and Events, Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facilities, and Racing Facilities
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1133
Title
Oysters – Tributary–Scale Sanctuaries
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1200 (SB0818)
Title
Environment – Permit Applications – Environmental Justice Screening
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1228 /CH0030 (SB0830)
Title
Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0064 /CH0474
Title
Beach Erosion Control District - State- and City-Owned Structures
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0201 /CH0133
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Property Appraisal Aids and Record Retention (Microfilm to Digital Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0541 /CH0039 (HB0727)
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0630 /CH0482 (HB0706)
Title
Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Office of Resilience
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0756
Title
University System of Maryland - County School Technology Pilot Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0818 (HB1200)
Title
Environment – Permit Applications – Environmental Justice Screening
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0830 (HB1228/CH0030)
Title
Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0869
Title
Baltimore City - Small Box Discount Stores - Zoning Requirements and Community Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0019 Education - School Construction - Pedestrian Safety Plans (Safe Walk to School Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0505 Montgomery County - Land Use Documents - Certification PG/MC 107-22 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0706 (SB0630/CH0482) Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Office of Resilience Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2022 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0784 /CH0420 Department of Natural Resources - Irreplaceable Natural Areas Program - Establishment Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0882 /CH0089 Natural Resources – Pocomoke River Wildland – Alteration of Boundaries Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0897 /CH0061 Economic Development - Sports Entertainment Facilities and Events, Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facilities, and Racing Facilities Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/08/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1133 Oysters – Tributary–Scale Sanctuaries Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1200 (SB0818) Environment – Permit Applications – Environmental Justice Screening Delegate Wells 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1228 /CH0030 (SB0830) Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate Delegate Crosby 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 30
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
SB0064 /CH0474 Beach Erosion Control District - State- and City-Owned Structures Senator Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0201 /CH0133 State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Property Appraisal Aids and Record Retention (Microfilm to Digital Act of 2022) Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 133
Budget and Taxation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0541 /CH0039 (HB0727) Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 39
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
Appropriations
SB0630 /CH0482 (HB0706) Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Office of Resilience Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0756 University System of Maryland - County School Technology Pilot Program - Established Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0818 (HB1200) Environment – Permit Applications – Environmental Justice Screening Senator Ellis 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0830 (HB1228/CH0030) Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
SB0869 Baltimore City - Small Box Discount Stores - Zoning Requirements and Community Agreements Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 3:17 PM
Click to return on the top page