Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Marriage -see also- Spouses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0300 /CH0927 (SB0136/CH0926)
Title
Family Law - Marriage Ceremony - Designation of Deputy Clerk
Sponsor
Delegate Toles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0406
Title
Marriage - Confidential Communication
Sponsor
Delegate Simpson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1386 /CH0128
Title
Education - School Employee Antibias Training - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1397 /CH0377 (SB0590)
Title
Civil Rights - Discrimination Based on Protected Characteristics and Reproductive Freedom
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0136 /CH0926 (HB0300/CH0927)
Title
Family Law - Marriage Ceremony - Designation of Deputy Clerk
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0590 (HB1397/CH0377)
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination - Protected Characteristics
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0300 /CH0927 (SB0136/CH0926) Family Law - Marriage Ceremony - Designation of Deputy Clerk Delegate Toles 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 927
Judiciary
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0406 Marriage - Confidential Communication Delegate Simpson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1386 /CH0128 Education - School Employee Antibias Training - Requirements Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Ways and Means
2/26/2024 - 11:00 AM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1397 /CH0377 (SB0590) Civil Rights - Discrimination Based on Protected Characteristics and Reproductive Freedom Delegate Simmons 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 377
Economic Matters
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
SB0136 /CH0926 (HB0300/CH0927) Family Law - Marriage Ceremony - Designation of Deputy Clerk Senator Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 926
Judicial Proceedings
1/11/2024 - 2:30 PM
Judiciary
SB0590 (HB1397/CH0377) Human Relations - Discrimination - Protected Characteristics Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2024 - 10:00 AM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:44 PM
Click to return on the top page