Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Marriage -see also- Spouses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0323 (SB0286)
Title
Domestic Partnership and Marriage - Required Information
Sponsor
Delegate Forbes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0495
Title
Education - Antidiscrimination Policies - Policy and Notice Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Kaufman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0928
Title
Estates and Trusts - Wills - Married Couples and Registered Domestic Partnerships
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0286 (HB0323)
Title
Domestic Partnership and Marriage - Required Information
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0936
Title
Consumer Protection - High-Risk Artificial Intelligence - Developer and Deployer Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0323 (SB0286) Domestic Partnership and Marriage - Required Information Delegate Forbes 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0495 Education - Antidiscrimination Policies - Policy and Notice Requirements Delegate Kaufman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0928 Estates and Trusts - Wills - Married Couples and Registered Domestic Partnerships Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
3/05/2025 - 3:00 PM
SB0286 (HB0323) Domestic Partnership and Marriage - Required Information Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2025 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
SB0936 Consumer Protection - High-Risk Artificial Intelligence - Developer and Deployer Requirements Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/2/2025 4:55 PM
Click to return on the top page