Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0377 (SB0278/CH0453)
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Installment Payment Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0416 (SB0399)
Title
State Government - Quasi-Governmental Units - Oversight and Governance
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1421
Title
Baltimore City – Lifeline Low–Cost Automobile Insurance Program
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0278 /CH0453 (HB0377)
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Installment Payment Plans
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0399 (HB0416)
Title
State Government - Quasi-Governmental Units - Oversight and Governance
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0377 (SB0278/CH0453) Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Installment Payment Plans Delegate Korman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0416 (SB0399) State Government - Quasi-Governmental Units - Oversight and Governance Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1421 Baltimore City – Lifeline Low–Cost Automobile Insurance Program Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0278 /CH0453 (HB0377) Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Installment Payment Plans Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Finance
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0399 (HB0416) State Government - Quasi-Governmental Units - Oversight and Governance President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/31/2022 5:14 PM
Click to return on the top page