Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0397 /CH0611
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Montgomery County - County Council and District Council - Voting Thresholds PG/MC 100-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1057 /CH0218
Title
Prince George's County - Recreation Blue Ribbon Workgroup PG 406-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1059 /CH0284
Title
Bicounty Commissions - Ethics - Certification of Compliance PG/MC 103-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1332 (SB0680)
Title
State and Local Parks - Playground Accessibility - Communication Boards
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0680 (HB1332)
Title
State and Local Parks – Playground Accessibility – Communication Boards
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0397 /CH0611 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Montgomery County - County Council and District Council - Voting Thresholds PG/MC 100-22 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 611
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1057 /CH0218 Prince George's County - Recreation Blue Ribbon Workgroup PG 406-22 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1059 /CH0284 Bicounty Commissions - Ethics - Certification of Compliance PG/MC 103-22 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1332 (SB0680) State and Local Parks - Playground Accessibility - Communication Boards Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
SB0680 (HB1332) State and Local Parks – Playground Accessibility – Communication Boards Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:09 PM
Click to return on the top page