Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0272 /CH0061 (SB0236/CH0062)
Title
Maryland Department of Planning – Modernization
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1470
Title
Prince George's County - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area Protection Program - Cutting or Clearing Trees MC/PG 113-25
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1519
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0236 /CH0062 (HB0272/CH0061)
Title
Maryland Department of Planning - Modernization
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0272 /CH0061 (SB0236/CH0062) Maryland Department of Planning – Modernization Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2025 - 2:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1470 Prince George's County - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area Protection Program - Cutting or Clearing Trees MC/PG 113-25 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1519 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2025 - 2:40 PM
SB0236 /CH0062 (HB0272/CH0061) Maryland Department of Planning - Modernization Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/21/2025 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2025 3:50 PM
Click to return on the top page