Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Meat, Poultry, Seafood -see also- Clams; Crabs; Oysters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0109 /CH0579 (SB0285/CH0580)
Title
Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0010 /CH0081
Title
Natural Resources - Oysters, Clams, and Clamming - Licenses and Regulations
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0056 /CH0128
Title
Secretary of Agriculture - Regulation of Poultry to Protect Animal Health and Control Avian Influenza
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0285 /CH0580 (HB0109/CH0579)
Title
Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0109 /CH0579 (SB0285/CH0580) Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 579
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0010 /CH0081 Natural Resources - Oysters, Clams, and Clamming - Licenses and Regulations Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2019 - 3:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0056 /CH0128 Secretary of Agriculture - Regulation of Poultry to Protect Animal Health and Control Avian Influenza Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2019 - 4:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0285 /CH0580 (HB0109/CH0579) Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 580
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM
Click to return on the top page