Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Mediation -see also- Arbitration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0023
Title
School Discipline - Data Collection
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0604 (SB0512)
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Correctional Ombudsman
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0850 (SB0666)
Title
Schools, Prekindergarten Programs, and County Boards of Education - Discrimination
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1058
Title
Justice and Public Health Prioritization Council
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1485
Title
Trustees of the Walters Art Gallery - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0277
Title
Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Division of Correction - Data Requirement
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0389
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Accountability Act Revisions and Clarifications
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0512 (HB0604)
Title
Office of the Attorney General – Correctional Ombudsman
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0666 (HB0850)
Title
Schools, Prekindergarten Programs, and County Boards of Education – Discrimination
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0023 School Discipline - Data Collection Delegate Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0604 (SB0512) Office of the Attorney General - Correctional Ombudsman Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0850 (SB0666) Schools, Prekindergarten Programs, and County Boards of Education - Discrimination Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1058 Justice and Public Health Prioritization Council Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1485 Trustees of the Walters Art Gallery - Collective Bargaining Delegate Wells 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Appropriations
Appropriations
SB0154 Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0277 Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Division of Correction - Data Requirement Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0389 Public Safety - Maryland Police Accountability Act Revisions and Clarifications Senator Jackson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/08/2022 - 9:00 AM
SB0512 (HB0604) Office of the Attorney General – Correctional Ombudsman Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0666 (HB0850) Schools, Prekindergarten Programs, and County Boards of Education – Discrimination Senator McCray 2 2 In the House - Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2022 10:06 AM
Click to return on the top page