Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Medical Examiners

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0373
Title
State Postmortem Examiners Commission - Minimum Staffing Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0462 (SB0159)
Title
Health Occupations - Authorized Prescribers - Reporting of Financial Gratuities or Incentives
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0699
Title
Behavioral Health - Grief Counseling Services
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1074 (SB0779)
Title
Office of the Chief Medical Examiner - Access to Records - Attorney General
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0159 (HB0462)
Title
Health Occupations - Authorized Prescribers - Financial Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0779 (HB1074)
Title
Office of the Chief Medical Examiner – Access to Records – Attorney General
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0373 State Postmortem Examiners Commission - Minimum Staffing Requirements Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0462 (SB0159) Health Occupations - Authorized Prescribers - Reporting of Financial Gratuities or Incentives Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0699 Behavioral Health - Grief Counseling Services Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1074 (SB0779) Office of the Chief Medical Examiner - Access to Records - Attorney General Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
SB0159 (HB0462) Health Occupations - Authorized Prescribers - Financial Reporting Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0779 (HB1074) Office of the Chief Medical Examiner – Access to Records – Attorney General Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/8/2022 10:09 AM
Click to return on the top page