Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Medical Malpractice

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0670
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Study on Expansion of Interstate Telehealth
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0717
Title
Health Care Alternative Dispute Resolution Office - Authority of Director - Dispositive Issues of Law
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1219 /CH0371
Title
Pharmacists - Status as Health Care Providers and Study on Reimbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1360
Title
Public Health - Abortion-Inducing Drugs
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0605
Title
Medical Malpractice – Collateral Sources
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0670 Maryland Health Care Commission - Study on Expansion of Interstate Telehealth Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0717 Health Care Alternative Dispute Resolution Office - Authority of Director - Dispositive Issues of Law Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1219 /CH0371 Pharmacists - Status as Health Care Providers and Study on Reimbursement Delegate Bhandari 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1360 Public Health - Abortion-Inducing Drugs Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0154 Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0605 Medical Malpractice – Collateral Sources Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2022 3:20 PM
Click to return on the top page