Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Medical Schools

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0228
Title
University of Maryland Medical System - Applicability of the Public Information Act and Open Meetings Act
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0301 /CH0508 (SB0265/CH0509)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0702
Title
Higher Education - Standardized Tests - Prohibition of Use in Student Admissions
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0710 (SB0465)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Programs - Dental Providers and Dental Students - Reimbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0758 /CH0462 (SB0684/CH0463)
Title
Maryland Licensure of Certified Midwives Act
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0265 /CH0509 (HB0301/CH0508)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0465 (HB0710)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Programs - Dental Providers and Dental Students - Reimbursement
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0684 /CH0463 (HB0758/CH0462)
Title
Maryland Licensure of Certified Midwives Act
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0836 /CH0361
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners Disciplinary Process and Actions Report
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0228 University of Maryland Medical System - Applicability of the Public Information Act and Open Meetings Act Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB0301 /CH0508 (SB0265/CH0509) Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions Delegate Shetty 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 508
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2021 - 4:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0702 Higher Education - Standardized Tests - Prohibition of Use in Student Admissions Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0710 (SB0465) Maryland Medical Assistance Programs - Dental Providers and Dental Students - Reimbursement Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0758 /CH0462 (SB0684/CH0463) Maryland Licensure of Certified Midwives Act Delegate Bagnall 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 462
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0265 /CH0509 (HB0301/CH0508) Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 509
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
SB0465 (HB0710) Maryland Medical Assistance Programs - Dental Providers and Dental Students - Reimbursement Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0684 /CH0463 (HB0758/CH0462) Maryland Licensure of Certified Midwives Act Senator Lam 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 463
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0836 /CH0361 State Board of Dental Examiners Disciplinary Process and Actions Report Senator Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 361
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:16 PM
Click to return on the top page