Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Maryland Emergency Management Agency

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0295 /CH0640 (SB0227/CH0641)
Title
Water Pollution - Stormwater Management Regulations and Watershed Implementation Plans - Review and Update
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0635
Title
Maryland Emergency Management Agency, Department of Transportation, and Department of the Environment – Study on Historic and Recent Flooding in Prince George’s County PG 407–21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0831 /CH0724 (SB0723/CH0725)
Title
Maryland Food System Resiliency Council
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0879 (SB0069)
Title
Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations - Maryland Cybersecurity Council Study and Report
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0989 /CH0378 (SB0714/CH0379)
Title
Public Safety – 9–1–1 Emergency Telephone System – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1276
Title
Maryland Emergency Management Agency – Emergency Planning and Management Cultural Competency – Study
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0068
Title
Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0069 (HB0879)
Title
Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations - Establishment and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0227 /CH0641 (HB0295/CH0640)
Title
Water Pollution - Stormwater Management Regulations and Watershed Implementation Plans - Review and Update
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0039 (HB0612)
Title
Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0631
Title
Workgroup to Study and Implement a Statewide 3-1-1 Nonemergency Telephone System
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0714 /CH0379 (HB0989/CH0378)
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0723 /CH0725 (HB0831/CH0724)
Title
Maryland Food System Resiliency Council
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0822
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Emergency Management Agency - Office of Resilience
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0901 /CH0644
Title
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Resilient Maryland Revolving Loan Fund
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0953
Title
Domestic Terrorism Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0295 /CH0640 (SB0227/CH0641) Water Pollution - Stormwater Management Regulations and Watershed Implementation Plans - Review and Update Delegate Love 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 640
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0635 Maryland Emergency Management Agency, Department of Transportation, and Department of the Environment – Study on Historic and Recent Flooding in Prince George’s County PG 407–21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0831 /CH0724 (SB0723/CH0725) Maryland Food System Resiliency Council Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 724
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0879 (SB0069) Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations - Maryland Cybersecurity Council Study and Report Delegate Watson, R. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Rules
HB0989 /CH0378 (SB0714/CH0379) Public Safety – 9–1–1 Emergency Telephone System – Alterations Delegate Krebs 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 378
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1276 Maryland Emergency Management Agency – Emergency Planning and Management Cultural Competency – Study Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0068 Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Establishment Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
SB0069 (HB0879) Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations - Establishment and Reporting Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2021 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0227 /CH0641 (HB0295/CH0640) Water Pollution - Stormwater Management Regulations and Watershed Implementation Plans - Review and Update Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 641
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0496 /CH0039 (HB0612) Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0631 Workgroup to Study and Implement a Statewide 3-1-1 Nonemergency Telephone System Senator Kagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2021 - 2:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0714 /CH0379 (HB0989/CH0378) Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - Alterations Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 379
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0723 /CH0725 (HB0831/CH0724) Maryland Food System Resiliency Council Senator Hester 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 725
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0822 Public Safety - Maryland Emergency Management Agency - Office of Resilience Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0901 /CH0644 Public Safety - Emergency Management - Resilient Maryland Revolving Loan Fund Senator Hester 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 644
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0953 Domestic Terrorism Task Force Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:21 AM
Click to return on the top page