Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Mentors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096
Title
Public Schools – School Psychologist Recruitment Program
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1337 (SB0800/CH0677)
Title
Inmate Training and Job Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0459 /CH0235
Title
Economic Development - Comprehensive Technical Assistance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0689 /CH0258
Title
Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs - Duties of the Special Secretary - Minority Business Enterprises
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0800 /CH0677 (HB1337)
Title
Inmate Training and Job Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1096 Public Schools – School Psychologist Recruitment Program Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1337 (SB0800/CH0677) Inmate Training and Job Act of 2021 Delegate Proctor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0459 /CH0235 Economic Development - Comprehensive Technical Assistance Program - Establishment Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Finance
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0689 /CH0258 Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs - Duties of the Special Secretary - Minority Business Enterprises Senator Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0800 /CH0677 (HB1337) Inmate Training and Job Act of 2021 Senator Patterson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:17 AM
Click to return on the top page