Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Military Department

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0273
Title
Public Safety - Militia - Active Duty Combat
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1033
Title
Environment and Energy - Investment in Overburdened Communities
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1223
Title
Study on REFUND - Re-Engineer Finances Under New Direction
Sponsor
Delegate Novotny
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1346 (SB0812/CH0242)
Title
State Government - Cybersecurity - Coordination and Governance
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0273 Public Safety - Militia - Active Duty Combat Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 3:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2022 - 3:00 PM
HB1033 Environment and Energy - Investment in Overburdened Communities Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1223 Study on REFUND - Re-Engineer Finances Under New Direction Delegate Novotny 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1346 (SB0812/CH0242) State Government - Cybersecurity - Coordination and Governance Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/31/2022 5:16 PM
Click to return on the top page