Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Militia

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0038
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Applicant Qualifications
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0195
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Health Care Pensions - Health Care Workforce Shortage
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0225 /CH0155 (SB0273/CH0154)
Title
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0359 /CH0614
Title
Militia - Maryland Defense Force - Enlistment Period
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0401 /CH0112
Title
Military Department - Powers of the Adjutant General - Summary Courts-Martial
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0558
Title
Maryland Liberty Preservation Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Dwyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 /CH0154 (HB0225/CH0155)
Title
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0038 Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Applicant Qualifications Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0195 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Health Care Pensions - Health Care Workforce Shortage Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0225 /CH0155 (SB0273/CH0154) Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0359 /CH0614 Militia - Maryland Defense Force - Enlistment Period Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 614
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0401 /CH0112 Military Department - Powers of the Adjutant General - Summary Courts-Martial Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0558 Maryland Liberty Preservation Act of 2013 Delegate Dwyer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0273 /CH0154 (HB0225/CH0155) Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/07/2013 - 1:45 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM
Click to return on the top page