Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Mining

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0531 (SB0181)
Title
Maryland Strong Manufacturing Development Act
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0576 /CH0398 (SB0525/CH0399)
Title
Maryland Dormant Minerals Interests Act - Use of Mineral Interest - Clarification
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0714
Title
Nursing Homes - Health Care Quality Account - Adoption and Use of Electronic Health Records
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0181 (HB0531)
Title
Maryland Strong Manufacturing Development Act
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0525 /CH0399 (HB0576/CH0398)
Title
Maryland Dormant Minerals Interests Act - Use of Mineral Interest - Clarification
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0531 (SB0181) Maryland Strong Manufacturing Development Act Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0576 /CH0398 (SB0525/CH0399) Maryland Dormant Minerals Interests Act - Use of Mineral Interest - Clarification Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0714 Nursing Homes - Health Care Quality Account - Adoption and Use of Electronic Health Records Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
SB0181 (HB0531) Maryland Strong Manufacturing Development Act Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0525 /CH0399 (HB0576/CH0398) Maryland Dormant Minerals Interests Act - Use of Mineral Interest - Clarification Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM
Click to return on the top page