Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Mobile and Manufactured Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0056 (SB0060)
Title
Motor Home and Recreational Trailer Shows - Out-of-State Dealers
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0379 /CH0597 (SB0547/CH0596)
Title
Wildlife - Traveling Animal Acts - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0538 /CH0122 (SB0484)
Title
Land Use – Affordable Housing – Zoning Density and Permitting (Housing Expansion and Affordability Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1397 /CH0377 (SB0590)
Title
Civil Rights - Discrimination Based on Protected Characteristics and Reproductive Freedom
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0060 (HB0056)
Title
Motor Home and Recreational Trailer Shows – Out–of–State Dealers
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0484 (HB0538/CH0122)
Title
Land Use - Affordable Housing - Zoning Density and Permitting (Housing Expansion and Affordability Act of 2024)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0547 /CH0596 (HB0379/CH0597)
Title
Wildlife - Traveling Animal Acts - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0590 (HB1397/CH0377)
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination - Protected Characteristics
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0056 (SB0060) Motor Home and Recreational Trailer Shows - Out-of-State Dealers Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0379 /CH0597 (SB0547/CH0596) Wildlife - Traveling Animal Acts - Prohibition Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2024 - 1:15 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0538 /CH0122 (SB0484) Land Use – Affordable Housing – Zoning Density and Permitting (Housing Expansion and Affordability Act of 2024) Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1397 /CH0377 (SB0590) Civil Rights - Discrimination Based on Protected Characteristics and Reproductive Freedom Delegate Simmons 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 377
Economic Matters
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
SB0060 (HB0056) Motor Home and Recreational Trailer Shows – Out–of–State Dealers Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0484 (HB0538/CH0122) Land Use - Affordable Housing - Zoning Density and Permitting (Housing Expansion and Affordability Act of 2024) President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/01/2024 - 9:00 AM
SB0547 /CH0596 (HB0379/CH0597) Wildlife - Traveling Animal Acts - Prohibition Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 596
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0590 (HB1397/CH0377) Human Relations - Discrimination - Protected Characteristics Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2024 - 10:00 AM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/21/2024 10:49 AM
Click to return on the top page