Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Mortgages

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0117)
Title
Workgroup on Minority Homeownership, Neighborhood Revitalization, and Household Wealth Equity
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0517 (SB0319)
Title
Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0608 (SB0890)
Title
Early Childhood Education - Child Care Provider Support Grant Program (The Child Care Provider Support Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0943 (SB0637)
Title
Community Development Administration – Live Near Your School Program – Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1009 (SB0724)
Title
Mortgage Servicers - Requirements and Prohibitions During and After a State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1014 (SB0772)
Title
Small Business COVID-19 Relief Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1196 (SB0457)
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation - Reverse Mortgage Loans Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1213
Title
Financial Institutions - Determination of Creditworthiness - Evaluation Rules and Alternative Methods
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1368
Title
Overdue State Property Taxes – Waiver of Interest and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1370
Title
Nonfederal Residential Mortgage Loans – Forbearance During a State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency for COVID–19
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0117 (HB0058)
Title
Workgroup on Minority Homeownership, Neighborhood Revitalization, and Household Wealth Equity
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0251 /CH0101
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Licensing of Nondepository Institutions - Elimination of Paper License Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0319 (HB0517)
Title
Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0457 (HB1196)
Title
Commercial Law – Credit Regulation – Reverse Mortgage Loans Act – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0637 (HB0943)
Title
Community Development Administration - Live Near Your School Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0724 (HB1009)
Title
Mortgage Servicers - Requirements and Prohibitions During and After a State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0772 (HB1014)
Title
Small Business COVID–19 Relief Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0890 (HB0608)
Title
Early Childhood Education – Child Care Provider Support Grant Program (The Child Care Provider Support Act)
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0937
Title
Housing and Community Development – Mortgage, Down Payment, and Settlement Expense Assistance
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0962
Title
Real Property – Satisfaction of a Mortgage – Required Homeowner’s Insurance (Cassidy’s Law)
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 (SB0117) Workgroup on Minority Homeownership, Neighborhood Revitalization, and Household Wealth Equity Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB0517 (SB0319) Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency Delegate Watson, C. 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0608 (SB0890) Early Childhood Education - Child Care Provider Support Grant Program (The Child Care Provider Support Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
HB0943 (SB0637) Community Development Administration – Live Near Your School Program – Establishment Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1009 (SB0724) Mortgage Servicers - Requirements and Prohibitions During and After a State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2021) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB1014 (SB0772) Small Business COVID-19 Relief Act of 2021 Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1196 (SB0457) Commercial Law - Credit Regulation - Reverse Mortgage Loans Act - Revisions Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1213 Financial Institutions - Determination of Creditworthiness - Evaluation Rules and Alternative Methods Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1368 Overdue State Property Taxes – Waiver of Interest and Penalties Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1370 Nonfederal Residential Mortgage Loans – Forbearance During a State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency for COVID–19 Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0117 (HB0058) Workgroup on Minority Homeownership, Neighborhood Revitalization, and Household Wealth Equity Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0251 /CH0101 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Licensing of Nondepository Institutions - Elimination of Paper License Requirements Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Finance
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0319 (HB0517) Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency Senator Hester 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (108-28)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0457 (HB1196) Commercial Law – Credit Regulation – Reverse Mortgage Loans Act – Revisions Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0637 (HB0943) Community Development Administration - Live Near Your School Program - Establishment Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2021 - 1:15 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0724 (HB1009) Mortgage Servicers - Requirements and Prohibitions During and After a State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2021) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0772 (HB1014) Small Business COVID–19 Relief Act of 2021 Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0890 (HB0608) Early Childhood Education – Child Care Provider Support Grant Program (The Child Care Provider Support Act) Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
SB0937 Housing and Community Development – Mortgage, Down Payment, and Settlement Expense Assistance Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0962 Real Property – Satisfaction of a Mortgage – Required Homeowner’s Insurance (Cassidy’s Law) Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:21 PM
Click to return on the top page