Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Mortgages

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0081
Title
Community Development Administration - Live Near Where You Teach Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0414 (SB0393)
Title
Economic Development - Project Restore Program and Fund
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0443 (SB0228/CH0037)
Title
Maryland Corps Program - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0594
Title
State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0803
Title
Residential Property Foreclosure - Filing and Adjudication of Counterclaims
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0929
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Opportunity Zone Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1038
Title
Foreclosure Proceedings – Residential Mortgagors and Grantors – Access to Counsel
Sponsor
Delegate Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1427 (SB0557/CH0717)
Title
Baltimore County - West Baltimore County Redevelopment Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0052
Title
Real Property - Satisfaction of a Mortgage - Required Homeowner's Insurance (Cassidy's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0228 /CH0037 (HB0443)
Title
Maryland Corps Program – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0393 (HB0414)
Title
Economic Development - Project Restore Program and Fund
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0557 /CH0717 (HB1427)
Title
Baltimore County - West Baltimore County Redevelopment Authority
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0821
Title
Medical Excellence Zone Compact
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0081 Community Development Administration - Live Near Where You Teach Program - Establishment Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0414 (SB0393) Economic Development - Project Restore Program and Fund Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0443 (SB0228/CH0037) Maryland Corps Program - Revisions Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0594 State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act) Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0803 Residential Property Foreclosure - Filing and Adjudication of Counterclaims Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0929 Department of Housing and Community Development - Opportunity Zone Fund - Establishment Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1038 Foreclosure Proceedings – Residential Mortgagors and Grantors – Access to Counsel Delegate Charles 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1427 (SB0557/CH0717) Baltimore County - West Baltimore County Redevelopment Authority Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0052 Real Property - Satisfaction of a Mortgage - Required Homeowner's Insurance (Cassidy's Law) Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0228 /CH0037 (HB0443) Maryland Corps Program – Revisions Senator Ferguson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 37
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
3/22/2022 - 1:40 PM
SB0393 (HB0414) Economic Development - Project Restore Program and Fund President 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0557 /CH0717 (HB1427) Baltimore County - West Baltimore County Redevelopment Authority Senator Sydnor 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 717
Finance
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0821 Medical Excellence Zone Compact Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:26 PM
Click to return on the top page