Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Mortgages

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0347 /CH0065 (SB0150/CH0066)
Title
Real Property – Recordation and Land Records – Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0747
Title
Environment - On-Site Wastewater Systems - Requirements for Inspection and Pumping Services and Extension of Sunset and Implementation Dates
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0769 (SB0682)
Title
Real Property - Residential Foreclosures - Commencement Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0796 /CH0581 (SB0566/CH0569)
Title
Real Property – Filing Fee for Residential Mortgage Foreclosure – Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Long, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1018 /CH0202 (SB0689/CH0203)
Title
Financial Institutions - Conventional Home Mortgage Loans - Assumption and Required Disclosures
Sponsor
Delegate Pruski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1040
Title
Real Property - Insufficient Condominium Reserve Account Grant Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1151
Title
Residential Real Property Sales – Appraisals
Sponsor
Delegate Taylor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1171 /CH0111 (SB0992)
Title
Corporations and Associations – Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1295
Title
Baltimore County - Transfer Tax - Exemption for First-Time Home Buyers
Sponsor
Delegate Long, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312
Title
Real Property - Partition of Property - Liens
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1424 /CH0097 (SB0683)
Title
Support and Protections for Individuals Affected by Federal Actions (Protect Our Federal Workers Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1516 /CH0119 (SB1026/CH0118)
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Application of Licensing Requirements (Maryland Secondary Market Stability Act of 2025)
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1557
Title
Program to Protect Individuals Unemployed or Furloughed Due to Federal Actions - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0150 /CH0066 (HB0347/CH0065)
Title
Real Property - Recordation and Land Records - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0469
Title
State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act)
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0566 /CH0569 (HB0796/CH0581)
Title
Real Property - Filing Fee for Residential Mortgage Foreclosure - Increase
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0682 (HB0769)
Title
Real Property - Residential Foreclosures - Materially Delinquent Mortgages
Sponsor
Senator Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0689 /CH0203 (HB1018/CH0202)
Title
Financial Institutions - Conventional Home Mortgage Loans - Assumption and Required Disclosures
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0831
Title
Credit Regulation - Reverse Mortgage Loans - Escrow Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0890
Title
Housing and Community Development - Division of Just Communities - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0992 (HB1171/CH0111)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1026 /CH0118 (HB1516/CH0119)
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Application of Licensing Requirements (Maryland Secondary Market Stability Act of 2025)
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0347 /CH0065 (SB0150/CH0066) Real Property – Recordation and Land Records – Requirements Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Environment and Transportation
1/24/2025 - 2:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0747 Environment - On-Site Wastewater Systems - Requirements for Inspection and Pumping Services and Extension of Sunset and Implementation Dates Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0769 (SB0682) Real Property - Residential Foreclosures - Commencement Restrictions Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0796 /CH0581 (SB0566/CH0569) Real Property – Filing Fee for Residential Mortgage Foreclosure – Increase Delegate Long, J. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 581
Judiciary
2/19/2025 - 11:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1018 /CH0202 (SB0689/CH0203) Financial Institutions - Conventional Home Mortgage Loans - Assumption and Required Disclosures Delegate Pruski 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Economic Matters
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1040 Real Property - Insufficient Condominium Reserve Account Grant Fund - Establishment Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB1151 Residential Real Property Sales – Appraisals Delegate Taylor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1171 /CH0111 (SB0992) Corporations and Associations – Revisions Delegate Amprey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Economic Matters
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1295 Baltimore County - Transfer Tax - Exemption for First-Time Home Buyers Delegate Long, R. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB1312 Real Property - Partition of Property - Liens Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1424 /CH0097 (SB0683) Support and Protections for Individuals Affected by Federal Actions (Protect Our Federal Workers Act) Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Appropriations
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1516 /CH0119 (SB1026/CH0118) Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Application of Licensing Requirements (Maryland Secondary Market Stability Act of 2025) Delegate Queen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Economic Matters
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1557 Program to Protect Individuals Unemployed or Furloughed Due to Federal Actions - Establishment Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0150 /CH0066 (HB0347/CH0065) Real Property - Recordation and Land Records - Requirements Senator Watson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 66
Judicial Proceedings
1/15/2025 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0469 State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act) Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0566 /CH0569 (HB0796/CH0581) Real Property - Filing Fee for Residential Mortgage Foreclosure - Increase Senator Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 569
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0682 (HB0769) Real Property - Residential Foreclosures - Materially Delinquent Mortgages Senator Charles 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0689 /CH0203 (HB1018/CH0202) Financial Institutions - Conventional Home Mortgage Loans - Assumption and Required Disclosures Senator Gile 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Finance
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0831 Credit Regulation - Reverse Mortgage Loans - Escrow Accounts Senator Charles 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0890 Housing and Community Development - Division of Just Communities - Establishment Senator Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0992 (HB1171/CH0111) Corporations and Associations - Revisions Senator West 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1026 /CH0118 (HB1516/CH0119) Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Application of Licensing Requirements (Maryland Secondary Market Stability Act of 2025) Senator Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Finance
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/15/2025 3:13 PM
Click to return on the top page