Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0051
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Personal Assistive Mobility Device - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0343
Title
Motor Vehicles - Special Deafness Registration Plate
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0756 /CH0747
Title
Vehicle Laws - Annual Vehicle Shows
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0969
Title
Suspension of Driving Privileges - Dispensing Motor Fuel Into Dirt Bike
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1360 (SB0449/CH0663)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1410
Title
Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0668 /CH0751
Title
Vehicle Laws - Operation of Motorcycles - Handlebar Height
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0051 Vehicle Laws - Electric Personal Assistive Mobility Device - Definition Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2017 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0343 Motor Vehicles - Special Deafness Registration Plate Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0756 /CH0747 Vehicle Laws - Annual Vehicle Shows Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 747
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0969 Suspension of Driving Privileges - Dispensing Motor Fuel Into Dirt Bike Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1360 (SB0449/CH0663) Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee Exemption Delegate Hixson 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1410 Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0668 /CH0751 Vehicle Laws - Operation of Motorcycles - Handlebar Height Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 751
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM
Click to return on the top page