Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Motorcycles, Mopeds, and Motor Scooters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0077
Title
Motor Vehicles – Operation of Dirt Bikes – Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Thiam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0206 /CH0567 (SB0465/CH0568)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Licenses and Permits – Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0894
Title
Transportation Electrification and Modernization (TEAM) Act
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1121
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Voluntary Developmental Disability Self-Disclosure Envelope
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1143 /CH0433 (SB0969)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1391 /CH0234
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0389
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Accountability Act Revisions and Clarifications
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0465 /CH0568 (HB0206/CH0567)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Licenses and Permits - Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0745
Title
Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0969 (HB1143/CH0433)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County – All–Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0077 Motor Vehicles – Operation of Dirt Bikes – Prohibited Acts Delegate Thiam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0206 /CH0567 (SB0465/CH0568) Vehicle Laws – Licenses and Permits – Prohibited Acts Delegate Moon 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 567
Environment and Transportation
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0894 Transportation Electrification and Modernization (TEAM) Act Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1121 Motor Vehicle Administration - Voluntary Developmental Disability Self-Disclosure Envelope Delegate Jones, R. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1143 /CH0433 (SB0969) Allegany County and Garrett County - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1391 /CH0234 Clean Cars Act of 2022 Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0389 Public Safety - Maryland Police Accountability Act Revisions and Clarifications Senator Jackson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/08/2022 - 9:00 AM
SB0465 /CH0568 (HB0206/CH0567) Vehicle Laws - Licenses and Permits - Prohibited Acts Senator Carter 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 568
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0745 Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0969 (HB1143/CH0433) Allegany County and Garrett County – All–Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/23/2022 4:56 PM
Click to return on the top page