Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0659
Title
Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Prices Listed on Dealer Website
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0208
Title
Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Prices Listed on Dealer Websites
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0659 Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Prices Listed on Dealer Website Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0208 Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Prices Listed on Dealer Websites Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:19 AM
Click to return on the top page