Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Motor Vehicle Insurance -see also- MD Auto Insurance Fund

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0057
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Rate Filings - Trade Secrets and Factors Used to Establish Rates
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0125
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Use of Gender
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0266 (SB0301)
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance – Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage – Opt–Out Option
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0368 /CH0549
Title
Vehicle Laws - Penalties for Lapse of Security - Grace Period
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0436
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History Rating Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0487 /CH0575 (SB0613)
Title
Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Foley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0587 (SB0573)
Title
Motor Vehicle Financial Protection Product Agreements Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0655
Title
Driving Without Required Security - Repeal of Incarceration Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0690
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0926 /CH0586 (SB0697/CH0587)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts - Policies of Insurance
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1229 (SB0835)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Comprehensive Coverage and Collision Damage Waiver
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1296
Title
Motor Vehicles - Driver's License and Insurance Offenses - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1421
Title
Baltimore City – Lifeline Low–Cost Automobile Insurance Program
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1460 (SB0428)
Title
Consumer Protection - Automotive Glass Repair or Replacement - Advanced Driver Assistance System Recalibration
Sponsor
Delegate Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0301 (HB0266)
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance – Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage – Opt–Out Option
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0428 (HB1460)
Title
Consumer Protection - Automotive Glass Repair or Replacement - Advanced Driver Assistance System Recalibration
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0573 (HB0587)
Title
Motor Vehicle Financial Protection Product Agreements Act
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697 /CH0587 (HB0926/CH0586)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts - Policies of Insurance
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0835 (HB1229)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Comprehensive Coverage and Collision Damage Waiver
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0992
Title
Claim Against Estate of a Decedent - Service of Process
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0057 Motor Vehicle Insurance - Rate Filings - Trade Secrets and Factors Used to Establish Rates Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0125 Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Use of Gender Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0266 (SB0301) Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance – Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage – Opt–Out Option Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0368 /CH0549 Vehicle Laws - Penalties for Lapse of Security - Grace Period Delegate Korman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 549
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0436 Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History Rating Policy Delegate Wells 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0487 /CH0575 (SB0613) Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements Delegate Foley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 575
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0587 (SB0573) Motor Vehicle Financial Protection Product Agreements Act Delegate Carey 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0655 Driving Without Required Security - Repeal of Incarceration Penalties Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0690 Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policy Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0926 /CH0586 (SB0697/CH0587) Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts - Policies of Insurance Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 586
Economic Matters
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1229 (SB0835) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Comprehensive Coverage and Collision Damage Waiver Delegate Carey 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB1296 Motor Vehicles - Driver's License and Insurance Offenses - Penalties Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1421 Baltimore City – Lifeline Low–Cost Automobile Insurance Program Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1460 (SB0428) Consumer Protection - Automotive Glass Repair or Replacement - Advanced Driver Assistance System Recalibration Delegate Watson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0301 (HB0266) Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance – Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage – Opt–Out Option Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0428 (HB1460) Consumer Protection - Automotive Glass Repair or Replacement - Advanced Driver Assistance System Recalibration Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0573 (HB0587) Motor Vehicle Financial Protection Product Agreements Act Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0697 /CH0587 (HB0926/CH0586) Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts - Policies of Insurance Senator Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 587
Finance
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0835 (HB1229) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Comprehensive Coverage and Collision Damage Waiver Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0992 Claim Against Estate of a Decedent - Service of Process Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:17 PM
Click to return on the top page