Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Motor Vehicle Registration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0178 (SB0408)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Race and Speed Contests - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0279 (SB0312)
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island and Taylors Island
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0346 (SB0435)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Failure to Pay Video Toll - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0383
Title
Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems – Exclusion of Vehicle Rental Companies – Repeal and Notification Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575 (SB0604)
Title
Cecil County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0595 (SB0726)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0863
Title
St. Mary’s County – Motor Vehicle Registration – Exception for Golf Carts
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1315 (SB0681)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates - Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0179
Title
Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0312 (HB0279)
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island and Taylors Island
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0373
Title
Vehicle Laws – Suspension of Driver’s License or Vehicle Registration – Unpaid Judgments
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0388
Title
Vehicle Registration – Disability Plates – Parking Meter Fees
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0408 (HB0178)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Reckless Driving, Speed Contests, Registration Plates, and Noise Abatement - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0435 (HB0346)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Failure to Pay Video Toll - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0586
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program – Exemptions – Older Drivers
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0604 (HB0575)
Title
Cecil County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0681 (HB1315)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates - Exception
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0726 (HB0595)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0847
Title
Department of Transportation – Vehicle Litter Reporting Program
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0178 (SB0408) Vehicle Laws - Race and Speed Contests - Penalties Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0279 (SB0312) Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island and Taylors Island Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0346 (SB0435) Vehicle Laws - Failure to Pay Video Toll - Penalties Delegate Carr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0383 Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems – Exclusion of Vehicle Rental Companies – Repeal and Notification Requirement Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0575 (SB0604) Cecil County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0595 (SB0726) Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0863 St. Mary’s County – Motor Vehicle Registration – Exception for Golf Carts St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1315 (SB0681) Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates - Exception Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0179 Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0312 (HB0279) Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island and Taylors Island Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0373 Vehicle Laws – Suspension of Driver’s License or Vehicle Registration – Unpaid Judgments Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0388 Vehicle Registration – Disability Plates – Parking Meter Fees Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0408 (HB0178) Vehicle Laws - Reckless Driving, Speed Contests, Registration Plates, and Noise Abatement - Penalties Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0435 (HB0346) Vehicle Laws - Failure to Pay Video Toll - Penalties Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0586 Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program – Exemptions – Older Drivers Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0604 (HB0575) Cecil County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0681 (HB1315) Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates - Exception Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2021 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0726 (HB0595) Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2021 - 12:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0847 Department of Transportation – Vehicle Litter Reporting Program Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 11:17 PM
Click to return on the top page